Nzamd Limited was incorporated on 02 Nov 1979 and issued an NZBN of 9429040794181. The registered LTD company has been managed by 6 directors: Justine Kippenberger-Montu - an active director whose contract started on 31 Mar 2023,
Jillian Mary Kippenberger - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2019 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2023,
Jeremy Howard Kippenberger - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Dec 1989 and was terminated on 26 Oct 2020,
Mark Howard Kippenberger - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Dec 2016 and was terminated on 01 Jul 2019,
Roderick Neill Gillespie - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Dec 1989 and was terminated on 05 Dec 2016.
As stated in our information (last updated on 30 Jul 2024), this company uses 1 address: 53-55 Manchester Street, Feilding, 4702 (type: physical, registered).
Up until 16 Dec 2021, Nzamd Limited had been using 81 Calcutta Street, Khandallah, Wellington as their physical address.
BizDb identified past names used by this company: from 02 Nov 1979 to 16 Jun 2009 they were called Nz Association Of Modern Dance Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Kippenberger, Mark Howard (an individual) located at Fendalton, Christchurch postcode 8052.
Previous addresses
Address: 81 Calcutta Street, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Jun 2020 to 16 Dec 2021
Address: 21 Ganges Road, Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 23 May 2011 to 15 Jun 2020
Address: 19-21 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 28 Mar 2006 to 23 May 2011
Address: C/- J H Kippenberger Esq, Chartered Accountant, 21-23 Ganges Rd, Khandallah, Wellington
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Mar 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 18 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Kippenberger, Mark Howard |
Fendalton Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Kippenberger, Jillian Mary |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2019 - 05 Jul 2024 |
Individual | Kippenberger, Jillian Mary |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2019 - 05 Jul 2024 |
Individual | Kippenberger, Mark Howard |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
07 Jun 2017 - 09 Jul 2019 |
Individual | Gillespie, Roderick Neill |
Lower Hutt Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
02 Nov 1979 - 07 Jun 2017 |
Individual | Kippenberger, Jeremy Howard |
Wellington New Zealand 6035 New Zealand |
02 Nov 1979 - 17 Dec 2020 |
Individual | Kippenberger, Jeremy Howard |
Wellington New Zealand 6035 New Zealand |
02 Nov 1979 - 17 Dec 2020 |
Individual | Kippenberger, Jeremy Howard |
Wellington New Zealand 6035 New Zealand |
02 Nov 1979 - 17 Dec 2020 |
Individual | Young, James Anthony |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
02 Nov 1979 - 07 Jun 2017 |
Justine Kippenberger-montu - Director
Appointment date: 31 Mar 2023
Address: Rd 7, Feilding, 4777 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Mar 2023
Jillian Mary Kippenberger - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2019
Termination date: 31 Mar 2023
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2019
Jeremy Howard Kippenberger - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1989
Termination date: 26 Oct 2020
Address: Khandallah, Wellington 6004, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Dec 1989
Mark Howard Kippenberger - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2016
Termination date: 01 Jul 2019
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Dec 2016
Roderick Neill Gillespie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1989
Termination date: 05 Dec 2016
Address: Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2016
James Anthony Young - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1989
Termination date: 05 Dec 2016
Address: Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 20 May 2011
Khandallah Villas Trust Board Inc
21 Ganges Road
Amity Club Incorporated
21 Ganges Road
Flat Creek Coal Company Limited
23 Ganges Road
A.j. Woods Limited
31 Ganges Road
Affiliated Insurance Brokers Limited
31 Ganges Road
Village Quality Meats Limited
7 Ganges Road