Paystation Limited, a registered company, was registered on 30 Sep 2014. 9429041432969 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 8 directors: Anders Christopher Skoe - an active director whose contract began on 26 Jul 2019,
Jeremy Bernard Wade - an active director whose contract began on 22 Sep 2023,
Keely Jill Craig - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Dec 2021 and was terminated on 22 Sep 2023,
Jeremy Bernard Wade - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 May 2020 and was terminated on 17 Dec 2021,
Caroline Rachael Rawlinson - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Sep 2016 and was terminated on 22 May 2020.
Last updated on 28 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 2 Market Lane, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (types include: registered, physical).
Old names for this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 29 Sep 2014 to 01 Oct 2014 they were called Tmpay Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Trade Me Limited - located at 6011, 2 Market Lane, Wellington.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 07 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Trade Me Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037513696 |
2 Market Lane Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
30 Sep 2014 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Anders Christopher Skoe - Director
Appointment date: 26 Jul 2019
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jul 2019
Jeremy Bernard Wade - Director
Appointment date: 22 Sep 2023
Address: Ngaio, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Sep 2023
Keely Jill Craig - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Dec 2021
Termination date: 22 Sep 2023
Address: Paremata, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Dec 2021
Jeremy Bernard Wade - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 May 2020
Termination date: 17 Dec 2021
Address: Ngaio, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 22 May 2020
Caroline Rachael Rawlinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Sep 2016
Termination date: 22 May 2020
Address: Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Sep 2016
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jun 2017
Jonathan Keith Macdonald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2014
Termination date: 26 Jul 2019
Address: Brooklyn, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2015
Colin James Rohloff - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 May 2016
Termination date: 06 Sep 2016
Address: Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 2016
Jonathan Carl Klouwens - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2014
Termination date: 12 May 2016
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2015
Tmg Trustee Limited
Level 5
Barford Properties Limited
607/1 Market Lane
Braithwaite Limited
701/1 Market Lane
Bowyer Investments Limited
702/1 Market Lane
Gere Investments Limited
Apartment 703, 1 Market Lane
Egley Properties Limited
Apartment 1105, 1 Market Lane