Spoilt Boutique Limited was incorporated on 08 Oct 2014 and issued an NZBN of 9429041444634. The registered LTD company has been managed by 1 director, named Jan Michelle Gourley - an active director whose contract started on 08 Oct 2014.
As stated in our information (last updated on 07 Aug 2024), the company registered 3 addresses: Unit 3, 140 Colombo Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 (office address),
34 Allen Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (registered address),
34 Allen Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (service address),
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (physical address) among others.
Up to 17 Apr 2024, Spoilt Boutique Limited had been using Level 3, 50 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their service address.
BizDb found previous names for the company: from 07 Oct 2014 to 29 Nov 2016 they were called Recovery Cushions Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Long, Matthew David (an individual) located at Halswell, Christchurch postcode 8025.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Gourley, Jan Michelle - located at Halswell, Christchurch.
The next share allocation (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Gourley, Jan Michelle, located at Halswell, Christchurch (a director),
Long, Matthew David, located at Halswell, Christchurch (an individual). Spoilt Boutique Limited is categorised as "Womenswear retailing" (ANZSIC G425145).
Principal place of activity
Unit 3, 140 Colombo Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 3, 50 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Service & registered address used from 30 Sep 2020 to 17 Apr 2024
Address #2: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Mar 2017 to 30 Sep 2020
Address #3: Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Mar 2017 to 31 Mar 2017
Address #4: Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Oct 2014 to 14 Mar 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 09 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Long, Matthew David |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Gourley, Jan Michelle |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Director | Gourley, Jan Michelle |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2014 - |
Individual | Long, Matthew David |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2014 - |
Jan Michelle Gourley - Director
Appointment date: 08 Oct 2014
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Feb 2024
Address: Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2021
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Oct 2014
Direct Paper Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Ambrosia Nurseries Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Eagle Direct Limited
Level 4, 60 Cashel Street
Zs Investments 2013 Limited
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street
Weeping Angels Limited
Level 2, 329 Durham Street
Interpret Geospatial Solutions Limited
Level 1, 137 Victoria Street
Green Stripes Company Limited
Ashton Wheelans & Hegan Limited
Moutique Limited
88 Aston Drive
Norgate Consulting Group Limited
C/- Macfarlanes
On The Plus Side Limited
149 Victoria Street
Shopology Limited
86 Heaton Street