Etpm Limited was incorporated on 19 Jan 2015 and issued a business number of 9429041571644. This registered LTD company has been managed by 5 directors: Te Aroha Dawn Marshall - an active director whose contract began on 19 Jan 2015,
Esther Georgina Marlene Rawene Gray - an active director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2019,
Esther Gray - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Oct 2017 and was terminated on 10 Jun 2019,
Martha Beneez Bella Dib - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Jan 2015 and was terminated on 02 Mar 2015,
Maryanne Ashby - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Jan 2015 and was terminated on 02 Mar 2015.
According to our information (updated on 17 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 373 Parekura Road, Rd 2, Kaiwaka, 0573 (types include: office, other).
A total of 4 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 2 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gray, Esther Gerogina (an individual) located at Rd 2, Kaiwaka postcode 0573.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 2 shares) and includes
Marshall, Te Aroha Dawn - located at Rd 2, Kaiwaka. Etpm Limited has been classified as "Social and interpersonal skill training" (ANZSIC P821940).
Principal place of activity
373 Parekura Road, Rd 2, Kaiwaka, 0573 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 4
Annual return filing month: May
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 27 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Gray, Esther Gerogina |
Rd 2 Kaiwaka 0573 New Zealand |
27 Oct 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Director | Marshall, Te Aroha Dawn |
Rd 2 Kaiwaka 0573 New Zealand |
19 Jan 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ashby, Maryanne |
Melbourne Victoria 3810 Australia |
19 Jan 2015 - 03 Mar 2015 |
Individual | Dib, Martha Beneez Bella |
Raumanga Whangarei 0110 New Zealand |
19 Jan 2015 - 03 Mar 2015 |
Director | Maryanne Ashby |
Melbourne Victoria 3810 Australia |
19 Jan 2015 - 03 Mar 2015 |
Director | Martha Beneez Bella Dib |
Raumanga Whangarei 0110 New Zealand |
19 Jan 2015 - 03 Mar 2015 |
Te Aroha Dawn Marshall - Director
Appointment date: 19 Jan 2015
Address: Rd 2, Kaiwaka, 0573 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jan 2015
Esther Georgina Marlene Rawene Gray - Director
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2019
Address: Rd 2, Kaiwaka, 0573 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2019
Esther Gray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Oct 2017
Termination date: 10 Jun 2019
Address: Rd 2, Kaiwaka, 0573 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jun 2018
Address: Kaiwaka, 0573 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Oct 2017
Martha Beneez Bella Dib - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jan 2015
Termination date: 02 Mar 2015
Address: Raumanga, Whangarei, 0110 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jan 2015
Maryanne Ashby - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jan 2015
Termination date: 02 Mar 2015
Address: Melbourne, Victoria, 3810 Australia
Address used since 19 Jan 2015
Nailed It Building Limited
1216 Oneriri Road
Drain King 2016 Limited
1184 Oneriri Road
Amokura Associates Limited
1886 Whangarei Heads Road
Colour-nostics Limited
401 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Happily Equanimous Limited
151 Burnside Road
Life101 Limited
Rd2
Springboard Plus Limited
14b Albatross Road
Trinity Initiatives Limited
32 Pohutukawa Ave