Robert Street Holdings Limited, a registered company, was launched on 31 Jul 2015. 9429041874387 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Residential property operation and development (excluding site construction)" (ANZSIC L671180) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Stuart Victor John Knight - an active director whose contract began on 31 Jul 2015,
Stephen John Piper - an active director whose contract began on 31 Jul 2015.
Updated on 18 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 31 Frobisher Street, Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 (category: physical, registered).
Robert Street Holdings Limited had been using Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington as their registered address up until 17 Nov 2016.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 3 entities. Next there is the second group which consists of 2 shareholders in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Mar 2016 to 17 Nov 2016
Address: Level 5, 56 Victoria Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 31 Jul 2015 to 11 Mar 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 13 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Rea, Julie Maureen |
Island Bay Wellington 6023 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2015 - |
Director | Piper, Stephen John |
Island Bay Wellington 6023 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2015 - |
Individual | Treadwell, Mical Shane |
45 Johnstone Street Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Knight, Stuart Victor John |
Hataitai Wellington 6021 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2015 - |
Individual | Treadwell, Mical Shane |
45 Johnstone Street Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2015 - |
Stuart Victor John Knight - Director
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2015
Address: Hataitai, Wellington, 6021 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2015
Stephen John Piper - Director
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2015
Address: Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jul 2015
Ocean Direct (nz) Limited
31 Frobisher Street
Khandallah Road Holdings Limited
31 Frobisher Street
Daddy Moy Limited
29 Frobisher Street
Molly & Mae Holdings Limited
49 Frobisher St
Quaver Entertainment Limited
42 Frobisher Street
Pixel Limited
7 Dart Crescent
Clarob Properties Limited
246 Buckley Road
Horgan Homes Limited
18 Carlisle Street
Klauster Go Limited
21a Quebec Street
Mabuti Investments Limited
3 Arun Crescent
Paragon Holdings Limited
83 Eden Street
Queens Point Developments Limited
92 Queens Drive