Pcs Projects Limited was registered on 25 Aug 2015 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041934661. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: David Andrew Scragg - an active director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2015,
Frederick Ryder Verbeek Van Der Sande - an active director whose contract started on 25 Aug 2015.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 19 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 301O Botany Road, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 (category: office, physical).
Up to 08 Nov 2019, Pcs Projects Limited had been using 10 Alicia Road, Somerville, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Vds Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1023.
Then there is a group that consists of 3 shareholders, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Scragg, Richard Steven - located at Atwell, Western Australia,
Scragg, David Andrew - located at Somerville, Auckland,
Scragg, Claire Louise - located at Somerville, Auckland. Pcs Projects Limited has been categorised as "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 301o Botany Road, Golflands, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Office address used from 17 Apr 2024
Principal place of activity
10 Alicia Road, Somerville, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 10 Alicia Road, Somerville, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Aug 2015 to 08 Nov 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 16 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Vds Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046883308 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
06 Apr 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Scragg, Richard Steven |
Atwell Western Australia 6164 Australia |
06 Apr 2021 - |
Director | Scragg, David Andrew |
Somerville Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
25 Aug 2015 - |
Individual | Scragg, Claire Louise |
Somerville Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
06 Apr 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Verbeek Van Der Sande, Frederick Ryder |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
25 Aug 2015 - 06 Apr 2021 |
David Andrew Scragg - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2015
Address: Somerville, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
Frederick Ryder Verbeek Van Der Sande - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2015
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
3h Holdings Limited
10 Alicia Road
Ashbourne Marketing Limited
16 Alicia Road
Label Specialist Nz Limited
22 Alicia Road
Longly Limited
8 Westview Court
Cast Investments Limited
83 Edendale Road
Essential Investments Limited
19 Covina Place
B & Z Property Development Limited
102 Meadowland Dr
Get Hammered Building Services Limited
13 Rodney St
Holmes Carpentry Limited
20b Cosy Place
Just Built 24 Limited
Flat 2, 4 Gibraltar Street
Professional Cladding Solutions Limited
10 Alicia Road
Tian Yi Travel Nz Limited
37 Edendale Road