L&L Electrical Limited, a registered company, was launched on 18 Nov 2015. 9429042073901 is the business number it was issued. "Electrical services" (ANZSIC E323220) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Ying Liang - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jul 2016,
Yi Li - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Nov 2015 and was terminated on 26 Jul 2016.
Updated on 28 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 9 Frontiere Lane, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 (type: registered, physical).
L&L Electrical Limited had been using 5 Bomber Lane, Whenuapai, Auckland as their physical address until 11 Aug 2021.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Liang, Ying - located at 0932, Hillsborough, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
9 Frontiere Lane, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 5 Bomber Lane, Whenuapai, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Aug 2018 to 11 Aug 2021
Address: 40 Belfast Street, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Nov 2015 to 13 Aug 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 28 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Liang, Ying |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 New Zealand |
06 Apr 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Li, Yi |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 New Zealand |
18 Nov 2015 - 06 Apr 2016 |
Director | Yi Li |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 New Zealand |
18 Nov 2015 - 06 Apr 2016 |
Ying Liang - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jul 2016
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2022
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jul 2016
Yi Li - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Nov 2015
Termination date: 26 Jul 2016
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2015
Dsr Tech Limited
48 Belfast Street
Pc & Ek Limited
19 Pallister Drive
Blossom Media Limited
19 Pallister Drive
Nz Wushu Academy Limited
31 Belfast Street
Mario Maintenance Limited
13 Pallister Drive
Primo Enterprises Limited
18 Pallister Drive
Active Lighting Limited
61 Seacliffe Road
Dm Tech Electrical Limited
Flat 2, 193 Hillsborough Road
Licence To Wire Limited
13 Stephen Lysnar Place
Powerplay Electrical Limited
15 Eaton Road
Sigma Electrical Services Limited
83b Goodall Street
Sunderland Electrical Limited
99 Frederick Street