Kauri Mcarthur Ridge Limited was launched on 21 Dec 2015 and issued an NZBN of 9429042116202. The removed LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Stone Shi - an active director whose contract started on 21 Dec 2015,
Julia Jiyan Xu - an active director whose contract started on 21 Dec 2015,
Hong Lai Li - an active director whose contract started on 25 Oct 2016,
David Wong-Tung - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Dec 2015 and was terminated on 20 Oct 2016.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 01 Jun 2024), the company registered 1 address: 139 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: registered, physical).
Until 18 Aug 2021, Kauri Mcarthur Ridge Limited had been using Suite 109, Plaza Level, Aig Building, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000000 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 200000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Ngai, Ngan Ying (an individual) located at 200 Connaught Road, Central, Hong Kong.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 80% shares (exactly 800000 shares) and includes
Kauri Partners Limited - located at Auckland Central, Auckland. Kauri Mcarthur Ridge Limited was categorised as "Commercial property body corporates" (business classification L671220).
Previous addresses
Address: Suite 109, Plaza Level, Aig Building, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Nov 2018 to 18 Aug 2021
Address: 4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Aug 2018 to 21 Nov 2018
Address: 4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1141 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Aug 2017 to 10 Aug 2018
Address: 4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1141 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Dec 2015 to 23 Aug 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 24 Jul 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 200000 | |||
Individual | Ngai, Ngan Ying |
200 Connaught Road, Central Hong Kong Hong Kong SAR China |
16 Nov 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 800000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Kauri Partners Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045913259 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Kauri Connect Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031013857 Company Number: 3477713 |
21 Dec 2015 - 30 Mar 2017 | |
Entity | Kauri Connect Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031013857 Company Number: 3477713 |
21 Dec 2015 - 30 Mar 2017 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Stone Shi - Director
Appointment date: 21 Dec 2015
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Dec 2015
Julia Jiyan Xu - Director
Appointment date: 21 Dec 2015
Address: Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Dec 2015
Hong Lai Li - Director
Appointment date: 25 Oct 2016
Address: 8 Sceneway Road, Lam Tin, Kowloon, Hong Kong SAR China
Address used since 18 Jan 2018
Address: Ntl' Tourist Resort, Songjiang District, Shanghai, 201602 China
Address used since 25 Oct 2016
David Wong-tung - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Dec 2015
Termination date: 20 Oct 2016
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Dec 2015
Bliss Beauty Limited
4th Floor Smith & Caughey
Bell Corporate Trustee Limited
4th Floor
Reef Sports Limited
4th Floor, Smith And Caughey Building
Quipa Gp Limited
4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building
Quipa Tech Limited
4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building
Quipa Nz Limited
4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building
5m Management Limited
48 Shortland Street
Eastside Holdings Limited
Suite 10c, 50 Eden Crescent
Landplan Property Services Limited
B.d.o Spicers
Peak Village Communal Facilities Limited
Level 3, 35 High Street, Auckland
Scene 3 Management Limited
Level 29, 188 Quay Street
Spackman Property Services Limited
2c/79 Queen Street