Flying Dragon Trading Limited, a registered company, was launched on 21 Dec 2015. 9429042121381 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Wholesaling, all products (excluding storage and handling of goods)" (ANZSIC F373980) is how the company was categorised. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Junli Dong - an active director whose contract started on 05 Sep 2019,
Zuci Tang - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jan 2021,
Dan Yang - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Sep 2019 and was terminated on 01 Jan 2021,
Dan Yang - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Dec 2015 and was terminated on 01 Sep 2019.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 26 Greenfinch Road, Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616 (type: physical, registered).
Flying Dragon Trading Limited had been using 3/91 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland as their physical address up until 15 May 2020.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Tang, Zuci - located at 0616, Hobsonville, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: 3/91 Central Park Drive, Henderson, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Jan 2016 to 15 May 2020
Address: Flat 18, 45a Swanson Road, Henderson, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Dec 2015 to 15 May 2020
Address: Flat 18, 45a Swanson Road, Henderson, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Dec 2015 to 21 Jan 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 08 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Tang, Zuci |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
15 Feb 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Yang, Dan |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
07 May 2020 - 15 Feb 2021 |
Individual | Zheng, Yan |
Auckland 0610 New Zealand |
21 Dec 2015 - 13 Jan 2016 |
Individual | Dong, Junli |
Henderson Auckland 0610 New Zealand |
20 Feb 2020 - 07 May 2020 |
Individual | Yang, Dan |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
21 Dec 2015 - 20 Feb 2020 |
Junli Dong - Director
Appointment date: 05 Sep 2019
Address: Henderson, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Sep 2019
Zuci Tang - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jan 2021
Address: Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2021
Dan Yang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Sep 2019
Termination date: 01 Jan 2021
Address: Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616 New Zealand
Address used since 07 May 2020
Dan Yang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Dec 2015
Termination date: 01 Sep 2019
Address: Henderson, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Dec 2015
Cato Bolam Consultants Limited
89 Central Park Drive
Meanwhile Limited
87 Central Park Drive
Myndsurfers Limited
1st Floor, 87 Central Park Drive
The Landings Parnell Society Incorporated
C/-price Baker Berridge
Mdsl Trustee Company Limited
First Floor, 87 Central Park Drive
Structurflex Limited
101 Central Park Drive
Asian Relation Consultant Limited
11a Castaing Cre Te Atatu South
Croxsons Packaging Limited
293 Lincoln Road
Ins & Outs Limited
30 Provence Esplanade
Izas Limited
9e Moselle Avenue
Rdk Marketing Limited
79a Te Atatu Road
Voyage International Limited
13 Gordon Stanley Drive