Agri Leasing R1 Limited was incorporated on 12 Jul 2016 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042458449. The registered LTD company has been managed by 1 director, named Dion John Silich - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jul 2016.
As stated in the BizDb data (last updated on 09 Aug 2024), the company uses 2 addresses: 70 Maungakawa Rd, R.d.4, Cambridge, 3496 (registered address),
70 Maungakawa Rd, R.d.4, Cambridge, 3496 (service address),
147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 (physical address).
Up to 18 Apr 2023, Agri Leasing R1 Limited had been using 147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 998 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Fremantle Trustees Limited (an entity) located at R.d.4, Cambridge postcode 3496.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.1% shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Silich, Dion John - located at Cambridge, Cambridge.
The next share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Silich, Kate, located at Cambridge (an individual). Agri Leasing R1 Limited was categorised as "Dairy cattle farming" (business classification A016010).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 01 Jul 2022 to 18 Apr 2023
Address #2: 1 Carlton Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 May 2022 to 01 Jul 2022
Address #3: 147 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 May 2022 to 18 May 2022
Address #4: 1 Carlton Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Sep 2021 to 02 May 2022
Address #5: 411 Greenhill Drive, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Mar 2020 to 01 Sep 2021
Address #6: 12 Bethlehem Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Aug 2018 to 26 Mar 2020
Address #7: 12 Bethlehem Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Jul 2016 to 21 Aug 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 29 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 998 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Fremantle Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047485143 |
R.d.4 Cambridge 3496 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2019 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Silich, Dion John |
Cambridge Cambridge 3496 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Silich, Kate |
Cambridge 3496 New Zealand |
27 Mar 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Anthony Harris Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033671246 Company Number: 1898569 |
27 Mar 2018 - 16 Jul 2019 | |
Entity | Anthony Harris Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033671246 Company Number: 1898569 |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
27 Mar 2018 - 16 Jul 2019 |
Dion John Silich - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 2016
Address: Cambridge, Cambridge, 3496 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 2016
Bethlehem Pottery Club Incorporated
13 Bethlehem Road
Tony Han Optometrists Limited
7 Bethlehem Rd
Bexenterry Limited
6 Cherry Way
Total Chiropractic Limited
16 Bethlehem Road
Albert St Property Limited
Bethlehem Shopping Centre
Guang Zhou Bai Yun Limited
J10a Bethlethem Town Center
First Rate Limited
12 Bethlehem Road
Hjs Ag Limited
12 Bethlehem Road
Hjs Agri Leasing Limited
12 Bethlehem Road
Itf Farming Limited
86 Ninth Avenue
Jag Farms Limited
C/o Sharlene Darragh Accountants Limited
Ljb Contracting Limited
86 Ninth Avenue