The Napier Spiritualist Church Healing and Awarness Centre Incorporated, a registered company, was launched on 25 Sep 1981. 9429042727552 is the business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 7 directors: Judy Ward - an active officer whose contract started on 27 Apr 2022,
Cindy Carpenter - an active officer whose contract started on 27 Apr 2022,
Lorna Bird - an active officer whose contract started on 27 Apr 2022,
Pauline Morrish - an inactive officer whose contract started on 24 Jun 2020 and was terminated on 05 Jul 2022,
Grant Morrish - an inactive officer whose contract started on 24 Jun 2020 and was terminated on 04 May 2022.
Updated on 10 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company uses, specifically: C/-G Morrish, 36 Hyla Road, Haumoana, Hawkes Bay (postal address),
43 Barker Road, Marewa, Napier, 4110 (registered address).
Past names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 25 Sep 1981 to 03 Dec 2003 they were called Spiritualist Church Of New Zealand (Napier) Incorporated.
Judy Ward - officer
Appointment date: 27 Apr 2022
Cindy Carpenter - officer
Appointment date: 27 Apr 2022
Lorna Bird - officer
Appointment date: 27 Apr 2022
Pauline Morrish - officer
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Termination date: 05 Jul 2022
Grant Morrish - officer
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Termination date: 04 May 2022
Diana Jane Turner - officer
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Termination date: 04 May 2022
Sue Jackson - officer
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2020
Termination date: 04 May 2022
Latham Trustee Limited
89 Latham Street
Sirius Trust Board
70b Latham Street
Nitro Investments Limited
66 Barker Road
Napier Pottery Club Incorporated
Whitmore Park
Napier Technical Sport & Recreational Organisation Incorporated
Whitmore Park
Basketball Hawkes Bay Incorporated
96a Nuffield Avenue