Plm Holdings 2016 Limited was incorporated on 07 Dec 2016 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429045852954. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Lisa Kristine Taggart - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2016,
Mark Robert Taggart - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2016,
Paul Andrew Taggart - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2016.
According to our data (updated on 06 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 3A / 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 (types include: physical, registered).
Up to 17 Jan 2020, Plm Holdings 2016 Limited had been using 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch as their physical address.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 7 groups (11 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 3332 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Taggart, Lisa Kristine (a director) located at Belfast, Christchurch postcode 8051,
Wf Trustees 2016 Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch postcode 8013.
Then there is a group that consists of 3 shareholders, holds 33.32 per cent shares (exactly 3332 shares) and includes
Taggart, Lisa Kristine - located at Belfast, Christchurch,
Wf Trustees 2016 Limited - located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch,
Taggart, Mark Robert - located at Rd 1, Kaiapoi.
The third share allocation (3332 shares, 33.32%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Wf Trustees 2016 Limited, located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch (an entity),
Taggart, Paul Andrew, located at Rd 2, Kaiapoi (a director). Plm Holdings 2016 Limited is categorised as "Earthmoving services" (ANZSIC E321230).
Previous address
Address: 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Dec 2016 to 17 Jan 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 01 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 3332 | |||
Director | Taggart, Lisa Kristine |
Belfast Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Wf Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042148432 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 3332 | |||
Director | Taggart, Lisa Kristine |
Belfast Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Wf Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042148432 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2016 - |
Director | Taggart, Mark Robert |
Rd 1 Kaiapoi 7691 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 3332 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Wf Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042148432 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2016 - |
Director | Taggart, Paul Andrew |
Rd 2 Kaiapoi 7692 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Taggart, Paul Andrew |
Rd 2 Kaiapoi 7692 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Taggart, Lisa Kristine |
Belfast Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Taggart, Mark Robert |
Rd 1 Kaiapoi 7691 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Rickerby, Paul Gerald |
Saint Martins Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Wf Trustees 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030374492 Company Number: 4234278 |
07 Dec 2016 - 08 Dec 2016 | |
Entity | Wf Trustees 2013 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030374492 Company Number: 4234278 |
07 Dec 2016 - 08 Dec 2016 |
Lisa Kristine Taggart - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2016
Address: Belfast, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2016
Mark Robert Taggart - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2016
Address: Rd 1, Kaiapoi, 7691 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2016
Paul Andrew Taggart - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2016
Address: Rd 2, Kaiapoi, 7692 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2016
Wigram Close Investments Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Sacred Water Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Blondell Holdings Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Levide Capital Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Build Master Homes Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Capital Investment Planning Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Bay Drainage And Civil Limited
Same As Registered Office
Coalgate Earthworks Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Flex Contracting Limited
85 Picton Avenue
G Trax Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Port Hills Earthmoving Limited
Staples Rodway
Pro Tranz Earthmoving Limited
25 Mandeville Street