Gpk Capital Limited was started on 01 Dec 2016 and issued a number of 9429045854286. This registered LTD company has been managed by 1 director, named Gerard Phillip Kilpatrick - an active director whose contract started on 01 Dec 2016.
According to our database (updated on 18 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 20 Menzies Street, Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 (category: registered, physical).
Until 03 Apr 2020, Gpk Capital Limited had been using 14 Rimu Street, Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 10 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 10 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Kilpatrick, Gerard Phillip (a director) located at Sumner, Christchurch postcode 8081. Gpk Capital Limited is classified as "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245).
Principal place of activity
20 Menzies Street, Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 14 Rimu Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 May 2018 to 03 Apr 2020
Address: 20 Menzies Street, Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Dec 2016 to 15 May 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 09 May 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Director | Kilpatrick, Gerard Phillip |
Sumner Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2016 - |
Gerard Phillip Kilpatrick - Director
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2016
Address: Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2020
Address: Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2016
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2019
All About Heat Limited
66 Wiggins Street
Teamva Limited
66 Wiggins Street
Hartwell Holdings Limited
45 Wiggins Street
Erddig Limited
27 Menzies Street
The Sumner Bridge Club Incorporated
57 Dryden St
Global Registries Limited
37a Wiggins Street
Bryden Consultants Limited
106 Scarborough Road
Health Consultancy Limited
82 Nayland Street
Hollin Consulting (nz) Limited
65 Arnold Street
M Corp Limited
65 Colenso Street
Sumner Gasolinera Limited
1a Westridge
Taimana Partners Limited
93 Nayland Street