Sasar Limited was launched on 13 Feb 2017 and issued an NZ business number of 9429045939532. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Surendra Kumar Harirajh - an active director whose contract began on 13 Feb 2017,
Soloshini Harirajh - an active director whose contract began on 13 Feb 2017.
As stated in BizDb's database (last updated on 25 Mar 2024), this company registered 1 address: Suite A Floor 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: registered, physical).
Up until 04 Mar 2020, Sasar Limited had been using Level 6, Nzinvest House, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Harirajh, Surendra Kumar (a director) located at Pakuranga, Auckland postcode 2010.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99 per cent shares (exactly 99 shares) and includes
Harirajh, Soloshini - located at Pakuranga, Auckland. Sasar Limited was categorised as "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 6, Nzinvest House, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Mar 2019 to 04 Mar 2020
Address #2: Level 6, East On Quay, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Feb 2017 to 11 Mar 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 13 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Harirajh, Surendra Kumar |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Director | Harirajh, Soloshini |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2017 - |
Surendra Kumar Harirajh - Director
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2017
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2017
Soloshini Harirajh - Director
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2017
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2017
Aman And Ameet Holdings Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Fames5 Investments Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Valdo Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Durbin Holding Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
R Bull Enterprises Limited
Level 6, Nzinvest House
Picinini Property Invest Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
B & D Rentals Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Kealoha Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Keirjill Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Morton Rental Investments Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Rprr Investments Limited
Level 6, East On Quay
Windway Investments Limited
Level 6, East On Quay