Sharma Holdings (Palmy) Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 06 Jun 2017. 9429046170101 is the NZBN it was issued. "Liquor store" (business classification G412310) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Prince Sharma - an active director whose contract began on 06 Jun 2017,
Sahil Sharma - an active director whose contract began on 01 Feb 2018,
Aman Singh - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Feb 2018 and was terminated on 03 Oct 2019.
Last updated on 09 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 49 Dundas Road, Sanson, Sanson, 4817 (type: physical, registered).
Sharma Holdings (Palmy) Limited had been using 68 Weraroa Road, Waverley, Waverley as their registered address up until 12 Mar 2020.
Former names for this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 28 Aug 2018 to 03 Oct 2019 they were called Rangiora Liquormart Limited, from 02 Feb 2018 to 28 Aug 2018 they were called Stoke Liquormart Limited and from 02 Jun 2017 to 02 Feb 2018 they were called Takaro Enterprises Limited.
A total of 1500 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 375 shares (25%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 375 shares (25%). Finally there is the next share allocation (750 shares 50%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
49 Dundas Road, Sanson, Sanson, 4817 New Zealand
Previous address
Address: 68 Weraroa Road, Waverley, Waverley, 4510 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jun 2017 to 12 Mar 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1500
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 375 | |||
Individual | Singh, Aman |
Fitzherbert Palmerston North 4410 New Zealand |
05 Sep 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 375 | |||
Director | Sharma, Sahil |
Whitby Porirua 5024 New Zealand |
13 Jan 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 750 | |||
Director | Sharma, Prince |
Waverley Waverley 4510 New Zealand |
06 Jun 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Sharma, Sahil |
Woburn Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2018 - 21 Jul 2021 |
Individual | Singh, Aman |
Whanganui Whanganui 4500 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2018 - 03 Oct 2019 |
Individual | Sharma, Sahil |
Woburn Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2018 - 21 Jul 2021 |
Prince Sharma - Director
Appointment date: 06 Jun 2017
Address: Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2023
Address: Sanson, Sanson, 4817 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jul 2021
Address: Waverley, Waverley, 4510 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Jun 2017
Sahil Sharma - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2018
Address: Whitby, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jan 2022
Address: Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2018
Aman Singh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2018
Termination date: 03 Oct 2019
Address: Whanganui, Whanganui, 4500 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2018
Waverley Liquormart Limited
68 Weraroa Road
Roxburgh Forest Trustee Limited
87 Weraroa Road
Winchester Forest Trustee Limited
87 Weraroa Road
Romney Forest Trustee Limited
87 Weraroa Road
M.j. And L.o. Holdings Limited
87 Weraroa Road
The Silvereye Company Limited
87 Weraroa Road
Pangotra Holdings (taumarunui) Limited
57 High Street
Surinder Holdings Limited
5 Clive Street
The Silvereye Company Limited
87 Weraroa Road
The Silvereye Taranaki Limited
87 Weraroa Road
Vanjara 2015 Limited
87 Egmont Street
Waverley Liquormart Limited
68 Weraroa Road