Kdm Civil Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 12 Jul 2017. 9429046200662 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Construction machinery (excluding earthmoving equipment) hiring with operator" (ANZSIC E329205) is how the company was categorised. The company has been run by 4 directors: Nicola Mangan - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jul 2017,
Nicola Carleton - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jul 2017,
Emma Jayne Griffin - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Aug 2019 and was terminated on 25 Sep 2019,
Nicholas Keith Griffin - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Jan 2019 and was terminated on 02 Aug 2019.
Updated on 28 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 34 Hammond Road, Taradale, Napier, 4112 (category: registered, service).
Kdm Civil Limited had been using 13 Lotus Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui as their registered address up to 03 May 2022.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 13 Lotus Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 May 2021 to 03 May 2022
Address #2: 13 Lotus Avenue, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 May 2021 to 11 May 2022
Address #3: 108 Deep Creek Road, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Oct 2019 to 20 May 2021
Address #4: 69 Rosedale Road, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Jul 2017 to 03 Oct 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 16 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Mangan, Kevin |
Taradale Napier 4112 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Mangan, Nicola |
Taradale Napier 4112 New Zealand |
12 May 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Griffin, Emma Jayne |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2019 - 25 Sep 2019 |
Director | Carleton, Nicola |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2017 - 12 May 2021 |
Director | Carleton, Nicola |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2017 - 12 May 2021 |
Individual | Griffin, Nicholas Keith |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
14 Jan 2019 - 02 Aug 2019 |
Nicola Mangan - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 2017
Address: Taradale, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 16 May 2023
Address: Pirimai, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2022
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 12 May 2021
Nicola Carleton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 2017
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Sep 2019
Address: Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 2017
Emma Jayne Griffin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2019
Termination date: 25 Sep 2019
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Aug 2019
Nicholas Keith Griffin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jan 2019
Termination date: 02 Aug 2019
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jan 2019
Dong Run International Limited
67a Rosedale Road
Cqs Limited
123 Hugh Green Drive
Simply Mortgage Limited
123 Hugh Green Drive
Ww&q Sc Limited
119 Hugh Green Drive
Dongkwang Limited
119 Hugh Green Drive
Smile Dental Albany Limited
52 Rosedale Road
Conset Acquire Limited
7 Te Kea Place
D A Digger Hire Limited
28 Tudor Road
Darbro Limited
27 Gilbransen Road
Jais Landscape Limited
4 Victoria Street
Jax Shoreloading Limited
28a Chesley Place
Sutcliffe Earthworks Limited
3 Thuja Street