Wk Christchurch Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 30 May 2018. 9429046815088 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Accounting service" (ANZSIC M693220) is how the company is categorised. The company has been run by 3 directors: Hamish William Morrow - an active director whose contract began on 30 May 2018,
Aaron Hamish Cassidy - an active director whose contract began on 30 May 2018,
Simon John Ross - an active director whose contract began on 01 Oct 2021.
Updated on 20 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 62 Riccarton Road, Christchurch, 8011 (category: registered, physical).
Wk Christchurch Limited had been using 2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim as their registered address up to 20 Oct 2022.
A total of 10001 shares are allocated to 10 shareholders (8 groups). The first group includes 5995 shares (59.94%) held by 3 entities. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 1001 shares (10.01%). Finally the third share allotment (2996 shares 29.96%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous address
Address: 2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 May 2018 to 20 Oct 2022
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10001
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 30 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5995 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | C.a.s.h Investment Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051975531 |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
23 Apr 2024 - |
Individual | Cassidy, Sarah Jane |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Director | Cassidy, Aaron Hamish |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1001 | |||
Director | Ross, Simon John |
Lincoln Lincoln 7608 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 2996 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Wk Office Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032012330 |
Mayfield Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
04 May 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Forsyth, Craig Alexander John |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Harris, Michael Vaughan |
Springlands Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Sinclair, Graham Neil |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Morrow, Hamish William |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Director | Cassidy, Aaron Hamish |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Carter, Ken Eric |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 New Zealand |
09 Mar 2020 - 23 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Carter, Ken Eric |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 New Zealand |
09 Mar 2020 - 23 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Kerr, Mathew Brian John |
Rd 3 Spring Creek 7273 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - 13 Jul 2023 |
Entity | Wk Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033558257 Company Number: 1917031 |
30 May 2018 - 04 May 2022 | |
Entity | Wk Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033558257 Company Number: 1917031 |
Mayfield Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
30 May 2018 - 04 May 2022 |
Hamish William Morrow - Director
Appointment date: 30 May 2018
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2018
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jun 2019
Aaron Hamish Cassidy - Director
Appointment date: 30 May 2018
Address: Prebbleton, Prebbleton, 7604 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2021
Address: Prebbleton, Christchurch, 7604 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2018
Simon John Ross - Director
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2021
Address: Lincoln, Lincoln, 7608 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2021
Wairau River Wines Limited
2 Alfred Street
8 Wired Brewing Limited
2 Alfred Street
Bryce Trustee Limited
2 Alfred Street
Alva Limited
2 Alfred Street
Crow Tavern Limited
2 Alfred Street
G & S Moleta Trustee Limited
2 Alfred Street
Accounting Easy Limited
32 Snowden Crescent
Logical Business Solutions Limited
13 Main Street
Mckendry Investments Limited
59 High Street
Roodakker Limited
139 High Street
Sass Nz Limited
Level 4 Rangitane House
Tva Limited
45 Queen Street