K&G Company Limited was launched on 07 Aug 2012 and issued a number of 9429030573161. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Kai Li - an active director whose contract began on 07 Aug 2012.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 25 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: Flat 1, 32 Halberg Street, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 (category: registered, physical).
Up until 15 Apr 2019, K&G Company Limited had been using 28 Tyburn Lane, Unsworth Heights, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 1 share is allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Li, Kai (a director) located at Glenfield, Auckland postcode 0629. K&G Company Limited has been classified as "Electrician" (ANZSIC E323225).
Principal place of activity
Flat 1, 32 Halberg Street, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 28 Tyburn Lane, Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Physical address used from 26 Nov 2013 to 15 Apr 2019
Address: 28 Tyburn Lane, Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Nov 2013 to 15 Apr 2019
Address: 1/32 Halberg St, Glenfield, Northshore, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Aug 2012 to 25 Nov 2013
Address: 1/32 Halberg St, Glenfield, Northshore, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Aug 2012 to 26 Nov 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 14 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Li, Kai |
Glenfield Auckland 0629 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2012 - |
Kai Li - Director
Appointment date: 07 Aug 2012
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2019
Address: Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Nov 2013
B & M Property (2008) Limited
20 Tyburn Lane
Haiku Lab Limited
3 Tyburn Lane
Aotea Accounts Limited
12a Tyburn Lane
Summ-moer Land Investment Limited
33a Bronzewing Terrace
G & J Trading Limited
25 Bronzewing Terrace
Coredu Consulting Limited
20 Westminster Gardens
Dual Venture Properties Limited
8/62 Paul Matthews Road
Oscar Electrical Limited
254a Sunset Road
Powercore Electrical Limited
106a Bush Road
Stephen Wood Electrical Limited
27c William Pickering Drive
United Homes Limited
28 Tyburn Lane
Zero Design Limited
46 Glen Vista Place