United Homes Limited was launched on 08 Dec 2016 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429045858086. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Ho Yin Pang - an active director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2016,
Hoyin Pang - an active director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2016,
Kai Li - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2016 and was terminated on 21 Jun 2018.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 19 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 299 Wairakei Road, Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8053 (types include: registered, service).
Up until 03 Sep 2018, United Homes Limited had been using 28 Tyburn Lane, Unsworth Heights, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb found previous aliases for the company: from 01 Dec 2016 to 29 Apr 2019 they were called United Electrical Engineering Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Pang, Hoyin (a director) located at Conifer Grove, Takanini postcode 2112. United Homes Limited has been categorised as "Electrician" (ANZSIC E323225).
Previous address
Address #1: 28 Tyburn Lane, Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Dec 2016 to 03 Sep 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 06 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Pang, Hoyin |
Conifer Grove Takanini 2112 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Li, Kai |
Unsworth Heights Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2016 - 30 Aug 2018 |
Ho Yin Pang - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2016
Address: Conifer Grove, Takanini, 2112 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2016
Hoyin Pang - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2016
Address: Conifer Grove, Takanini, 2112 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2016
Kai Li - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2016
Termination date: 21 Jun 2018
Address: Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2016
B & M Property (2008) Limited
20 Tyburn Lane
Haiku Lab Limited
3 Tyburn Lane
Aotea Accounts Limited
12a Tyburn Lane
Summ-moer Land Investment Limited
33a Bronzewing Terrace
G & J Trading Limited
25 Bronzewing Terrace
Coredu Consulting Limited
20 Westminster Gardens
Dual Venture Properties Limited
8/62 Paul Matthews Road
K&g Company Limited
28 Tyburn Lane
Oscar Electrical Limited
254a Sunset Road
Powercore Electrical Limited
106a Bush Road
Stephen Wood Electrical Limited
27c William Pickering Drive
Zero Design Limited
46 Glen Vista Place